open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

WASHINGTON PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington
    Case Number:2:12-cr-00044-1
    Party Name:USA v. Gebrehiwet
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release-Evidentiary Hearing]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Minute Order]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Witness List]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender (text only event)]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appearance Bond]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation Proceedings-Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?182241
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =