open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington

WASHINGTON PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01819
    Party Name:Mountaineers Foundation v. The Mountaineers
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (non motion)]
    Date Published:May 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response (non motion)]
    Date Published:May 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (non motion)]
    Date Published:April 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief]
    Date Published:April 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:April 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Rescheduled Hearing]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulated Motion]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulated Motion]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Note re compliance with LCR 83.2 - Attorney Appearance and With]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Order]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Counterclaim]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Calendar]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery and Depositions Order (FORM)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Status Report Order Form for Magistrate Judges]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent Letter & Form]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Filer]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?279819
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =