open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

WASHINGTON PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00385
    Party Name:Moat et al v. Lincoln Life Assurance of Boston
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Report - Rule 26 / Rule 16]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing - By Court]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference Notice]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Submission of Proposed Order]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.waed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?88425
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =