open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

WASHINGTON PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington
    Case Number:4:19-cv-05257
    Party Name:Havens v. Saul
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Stipulated Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulated Scheduling Order - Social Security Cases Only]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Administrative Record - Social Security Cases Only]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order IFP - non-prisoner]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order IFP -DENIED - non-prisoner]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.waed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?88424
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =