open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

WASHINGTON PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00101-1
    Party Name:USA v. Pruett
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Excludable XT started & stopped (extend trial date)]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment (with document)]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion to Continue Trial]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Order]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Rescheduled Hearing]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion for Detention]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Invocation of Rights at Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender (text only event)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?273826
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =