open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

WASHINGTON PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington
    Case Number:19-03071-7
    Party Name:CLAYTON VICKERS and SANDRA L VICKERS
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Application for Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch 7 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Statement of Witness]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Declaration Regarding Payments (LBR 1007-1)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Filing Fee - Waive Ch 7 Filing Fee]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Statement of Social Security Number (will only be viewable by the court, trustee, USTR)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.waeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?207476
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =