open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

WASHINGTON PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington
    Case Number:1:19-cv-03281
    Party Name:Edgar v. Saul
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:May 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice - Other]
    Date Published:May 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulated Scheduling Order - Social Security Cases Only]
    Date Published:May 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Administrative Record - Social Security Cases Only]
    Date Published:May 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order IFP - non-prisoner]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.waed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?88741
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =