open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington

WASHINGTON PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington
    Case Number:2:20-cv-01199
    Party Name:Williams v. Safeway Inc
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Order]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Status Report]
    Date Published:September 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Status Report Order Form for Magistrate Judges]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent Letter & Form]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Verification of State Court Records]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.wawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?288188
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =