open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

WASHINGTON PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington
    Case Number:1:20-cr-02039-1
    Party Name:USA v. Smartlowit
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Cancellation - By Court]
    Date Published:September 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:September 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Following Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
    Date Published:September 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:September 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:September 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
    Date Published:September 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Rights]
    Date Published:September 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
    Date Published:September 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Charges and Penalties]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.waed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?92367
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =