U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-02023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. George
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Motion Order - Article III Judge]
  • May 01, 2025: [Expedite]
  • May 01, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 01, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 21, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Court Only Motion to Seal Case]
  • March 19, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [z(Court Only) Motion to Seal Case]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Following Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 17, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
  • March 17, 2025: [Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • March 17, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 17, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 17, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Charges and Penalties]
  • March 11, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.