U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-02022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Figueroa
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Following Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 25, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 24, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
  • March 24, 2025: [Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • March 24, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Charges and Penalties]
  • March 11, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.