U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00178-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Finley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 30, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 17, 2025: [Detention Review Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.