U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-02025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Avila-Salceda
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • April 22, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 17, 2025: [Approval Institute PSI & Waiver of Fed. R. Crim. P. 32(e)(f) & (g) Prov.]
  • March 17, 2025: [Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
  • March 17, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util-Interpreter Required]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
  • March 17, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 17, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Charges and Penalties]
  • March 11, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.