U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-02020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kintner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 24, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Following Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • March 20, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
  • March 20, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 20, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 20, 2025: [Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
  • March 20, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Charges and Penalties]
  • March 11, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.