U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-02031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brookes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 18, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reopen Detention Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Detention Review Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Reopen Detention Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • March 14, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 13, 2025: [Appointment Order - Non-Appeal]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Charges and Penalties]
  • March 11, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.