U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-02027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Suarez-Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Motion Order - Article III Judge]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Excludable Start]
  • April 21, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial and Statement of Reasons (TOR and MKD cases)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Approval Institute PSI & Waiver of Fed. R. Crim. P. 32(e)(f) & (g) Prov.]
  • April 21, 2025: [z(Court Only) Oral Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 17, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util-Interpreter Required]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
  • March 17, 2025: [Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • March 17, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 17, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 17, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Charges and Penalties]
  • March 12, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.