U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-02019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marks
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 02, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Following Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 28, 2025: [Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • March 28, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
  • March 28, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Charges and Penalties]
  • March 12, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.