U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barrones-Madrid et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 24, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 19, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 18, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • March 13, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.