U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Goitom
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Acceptance of Plea of Guilty]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Report and Recommendation re Plea of Guilty]
  • April 01, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 01, 2025: [Consent to Rule 11 Plea]
  • April 01, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduled Hearing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.