U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00036-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Zazueta
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial and Statement of Reasons (TOR and MKD cases)]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 19, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Following Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • March 14, 2025: [Interpreter Required]
  • March 14, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 13, 2025: [Appointment Order - Non-Appeal]
  • March 13, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.