U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sulak
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order re Identification of Minor Victims]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order re Computer Forensic Review Procedures]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • April 09, 2025: [Protective Order re Identification of Minor Victims]
  • April 09, 2025: [Expedite]
  • April 09, 2025: [Protective Order re Computer Forensic Review Procedures]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • March 14, 2025: [Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
  • March 14, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
  • March 13, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.