U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-02032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Saldana
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order AO 199c]
  • April 30, 2025: [Detention Review Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 23, 2025: [Motion Order - Article III Judge]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Excludable Start]
  • April 21, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 21, 2025: [z(Court Only) Oral Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 17, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 13, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 13, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 13, 2025: [Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Following Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 13, 2025: [Appointment Order - Non-Appeal]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.