U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barquet
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Stipulated Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Excludable XT started & stopped (extend trial date)]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Stipulated Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Protective Order]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order re Due Process Protections Act (text only event)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Docket Text Modification]
  • March 20, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 20, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment (text only)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 20, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order for Issuance of Arrest Warrant]
  • March 12, 2025: [Indictment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Sealed Signature Page]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.