U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 05, 2025: [Declaration (non motion)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Report and Recommendation re Plea of Guilty]
  • April 29, 2025: [Consent to Rule 11 Plea]
  • April 29, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 29, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Continuing Trial Date]
  • April 08, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Stricken Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 08, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 07, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • March 21, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • March 17, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 12, 2025: [Acceptance of Plea of Guilty]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.