U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-02015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vargas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 14, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 14, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Appointment Order - Non-Appeal]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Referring to Magistrate Judge-Appoint Counsel]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 13, 2025: [Ex Parte Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.