U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Helman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Report and Recommendation re Plea of Guilty]
  • April 24, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Consent to Rule 11 Plea]
  • April 24, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Information - Felony]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Continuing Trial Date]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 27, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time-Other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.