U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00184-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Sheeran et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Acceptance of Plea of Guilty]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Report and Recommendation re Plea of Guilty]
  • April 09, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Consent to Rule 11 Plea]
  • April 09, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 26, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 25, 2025: [Application and Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum/Prosequendum]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Arraignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.