U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vega
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Continuing Trial Date]
  • March 31, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • March 28, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order re Due Process Protections Act (text only event)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender (text only event)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 13, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.