U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00069-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Sandoval et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • April 11, 2025: [Pet/O re Vio of Pretrial Release Conditions (After Deft Appears)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Petition]
  • April 11, 2025: [Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 11, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • March 14, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 14, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.