U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-02021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Motion Order - Article III Judge]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Excludable Start]
  • April 16, 2025: [Expedite]
  • April 16, 2025: [Joint Proposed Case Management Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial and Statement of Reasons (TOR and MKD cases)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 19, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Following Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • March 17, 2025: [Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • March 17, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
  • March 17, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 17, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.