U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00118-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Graves et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 29, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 22, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduled Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • April 02, 2025: [Acceptance of Plea of Guilty]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduled Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice-Other]
  • March 14, 2025: [Report and Recommendation re Plea of Guilty]
  • March 14, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Consent to Rule 11 Plea]
  • March 14, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.