U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Route
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • April 16, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 15, 2025: [Terminate Motions (Public)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Continue Trial]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 14, 2025: [Initial Appearance and Detention Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order re Due Process Protections Act (text only event)]
  • March 14, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment (text only)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.