U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wenzel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 18, 2025: [Attorney Withdrawal - USA]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 26, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Following Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order AO 199c]
  • March 17, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 17, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.