U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-02049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Slockish
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice - Other]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Following Arraignment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Charges and Penalties]
  • April 09, 2025: [Indictment]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motion Order - Article III Judge]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Excludable Start]
  • March 17, 2025: [Expedite]
  • March 17, 2025: [Joint Proposed Case Management Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial and Statement of Reasons (TOR and MKD cases)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.