U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-05279-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Acceptance of Plea of Guilty]
  • April 04, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 03, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 17, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.