U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00209-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rezene
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Acceptance of Plea of Guilty]
  • April 09, 2025: [Report and Recommendation re Plea of Guilty]
  • April 09, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Consent to Rule 11 Plea]
  • April 09, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment (with document)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 17, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 17, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.