U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-05046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Altamirano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Continuing Trial Date]
  • April 22, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 22, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • April 14, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Stipulated Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Proposed Order (Unsigned)]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time-Other]
  • April 08, 2025: [Review of Detention Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Protective Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Invocation of Rights at Initial Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order re Due Process Protections Act (text only event)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 18, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 18, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.