U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-05043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Encinas et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 28, 2025: [Receipt for Passport]
  • April 25, 2025: [Appearance Bond]
  • April 25, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • April 25, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 23, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Pretrial Petition/Order-Other]
  • April 09, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [TLF Brady Order (FORM)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 09, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice-Other]
  • April 08, 2025: [Demand]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment (with document)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Detention Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 28, 2025: [Application and Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum/Prosequendum]
  • March 27, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Scheduled Hearing Not Held]
  • March 21, 2025: [Status Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order re Due Process Protections Act (text only event)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Appearance Bond]
  • March 20, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 20, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment (text only)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 20, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order re Due Process Protections Act (text only event)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 18, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment (text only)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Note on Docket (public entry)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 18, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.