U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cr-06026-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Defendants
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Appointment Order - Non-Appeal]
  • April 24, 2025: [Ex Parte Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Referring to Magistrate Judge-Appoint Counsel]
  • April 24, 2025: [Ex Parte Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion-By Court]
  • April 22, 2025: [Ex Parte Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea and Setting Sentencing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Information - Felony]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Motion Order - Article III Judge]
  • March 21, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial and Statement of Reasons (TOR and MKD cases)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.