U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-02013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castaneda
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Following Arraignment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Charges and Penalties]
  • April 09, 2025: [Indictment]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court]
  • March 20, 2025: [Expedite]
  • March 20, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 20, 2025: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.