U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Velasquez-Perez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Continuing Trial Date]
  • April 22, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue Trial]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2025: [TL Minute Order re Chambers Procedures]
  • March 21, 2025: [TL Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Arraignment Letter]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Continuing Release/Detention]
  • March 20, 2025: [Indictment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Sealed Signature Page]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.