U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-06010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez-Spindola
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Motion Order - Article III Judge]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Excludable Start]
  • May 01, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial and Statement of Reasons (TOR and MKD cases)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial and Statement of Reasons (TOR and MKD cases)]
  • April 30, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Court Only Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • March 27, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [z(Court Only) Oral Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Cancellation and Notice of Hearing - By Court]
  • March 21, 2025: [Attorney Withdrawal & Substitution - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2025: [Charges and Penalties]
  • March 20, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.