U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-06011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cruz-Agustin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Following Arraignment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Arraignment]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • March 28, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Cancellation and Notice of Hearing - By Court]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2025: [Charges and Penalties]
  • March 20, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.