U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Salata
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order re Identification of Minor Victims]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order re Computer Forensic Review Procedures]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Protective Order re Identification of Minor Victims]
  • March 31, 2025: [Protective Order re Computer Forensic Review Procedures]
  • March 31, 2025: [Expedite]
  • March 31, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 21, 2025: [Charges and Penalties]
  • March 21, 2025: [Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • March 21, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Cancellation and Notice of Hearing - By Court]
  • March 20, 2025: [Charges and Penalties]
  • March 20, 2025: [Indictment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Court Only Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.