U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-05045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Denham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Excludable XT started & stopped (extend trial date)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time-Other]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extension of Time-Other]
  • April 01, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order re Due Process Protections Act (text only event)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Invocation of Rights at Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender (text only event)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 25, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.