U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-06018-5
  • Case Name: USA v. Villalobos et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 30, 2025: [Statement of Reasons by Deft in Support of the M/Continue Trial]
  • April 30, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial and Statement of Reasons (TOR and MKD cases)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea and Setting Sentencing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Information - Felony]
  • April 17, 2025: [Expedite]
  • April 17, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial and Statement of Reasons (TOR and MKD cases)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 10, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.