U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cr-06016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Espindola
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order AO 199c]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Court Only Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Pet/O re Vio of Pretrial Release Conditions (After Deft Appears)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Petition]
  • April 22, 2025: [Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • April 22, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • April 22, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 22, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Defender - SR Violation]
  • April 22, 2025: [z(Court Only) Oral Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • April 16, 2025: [Expedite]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • April 02, 2025: [Expedite]
  • April 02, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.