U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McClain
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 29, 2025: [Information to Establish Prior Conviction]
  • April 29, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 29, 2025: [Jury Instructions - with cites - Proposed]
  • April 29, 2025: [Bill of Particulars]
  • April 29, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • April 28, 2025: [Trial Brief ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 28, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 28, 2025: [Voir Dire - Proposed]
  • April 28, 2025: [Jury Instructions - with cites - Proposed]
  • April 28, 2025: [Information to Establish Prior Conviction]
  • April 25, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 25, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued - Ex Parte]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count/Counts]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 23, 2025: [Ex Parte Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 22, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice re: Federal Rules of Evidence 404(b)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Use Expert Testimony/Evidence]
  • April 21, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion-By Court]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Use Expert Testimony/Evidence]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Use Expert Testimony/Evidence]
  • April 09, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Experts]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice re: Federal Rules of Evidence 609]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice re: Federal Rules of Evidence 404(b)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Dismiss Count/Counts]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.