U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-06013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Finch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Protective Order re Computer Forensic Review Procedures]
  • April 30, 2025: [Protective Order re Identification of Minor Victims]
  • April 30, 2025: [Expedite]
  • April 30, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Following Arraignment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Cancellation and Notice of Hearing - By Court]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.