U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pina-Gaona et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 09, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • April 09, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 09, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 08, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 07, 2025: [Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
  • April 07, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appointment Order - Non-Appeal]
  • April 03, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum]
  • April 03, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.